Financial history THE FRIENDS OF COLEFORD BISHOP HENDERSON SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1046558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £6.86k £9.12k £4.32k £8.97k £18.82k
Total expenditure £15.67k £6.02k £6.60k £11.62k £5.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A