Financial history CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH VICTORY CENTRE

Charity number: 1046586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £46.78k £31.99k £39.97k £45.78k £22.41k
Total expenditure £28.29k £39.51k £29.46k £28.71k £46.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A