Accounts and annual returns ST NICHOLAS (MANOR PARK) PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1046714
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 18 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 05 January 2005 On Time