Accounts and annual returns RICHMOND SUPPORT GROUP

Charity Number: 1046715
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2004 27 September 2005 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required