Accounts and annual returns THE 22Q11 GROUP (DIGEORGE AND SHPRINTZEN (VCFS) SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1046847
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 08 March 2010 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 06 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required