Accounts and annual returns THE TONY METHERELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1046899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 19 February 2025 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 15 August 2024 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 21 February 2023 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 May 2022 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 February 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required