Accounts and annual returns TORRINGTON FAMILY PROJECT

Charity number: 1046915
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2013 07 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2012 07 January 2014 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 07 January 2014 252 days late
Annual return 30 June 2011 23 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 01 May 2012 1 days late
Annual return 30 June 2010 23 April 2012 359 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 09 February 2011 On Time