Trustees WINGRAVE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1047059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonarhan Channer Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Ceilia Jacques Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Zoe Lear Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Adrian Cheshire Trustee 22 January 2024
None on record
Claire Heyes Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Hannah Fulton Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record