Financial history MARCHES FAMILY NETWORK

Charity number: 1047075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £219.33k £203.85k £268.71k £209.78k £324.58k
Total expenditure £244.84k £188.45k £203.32k £218.75k £263.34k
Income from government contracts £35.00k £27.79k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.67k £25.78k £904 N/A N/A