Financial history SOUTHEND VINEYARD

Charity number: 1047393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £371.61k £452.20k £313.68k £362.28k £278.64k
Total expenditure £368.67k £327.90k £373.27k £421.93k £348.54k
Income from government contracts £3.19k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £62.63k £76.85k £10.37k N/A £22.50k