Trustees TAMIL WELFARE ASSOCIATION (NEWHAM) UK
Charity number: 1047487

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pulendrakumar Gajavathanan | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rakavan Nadarajah | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Showmeya Jivathas | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thabesh Wijayaratnam | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janani Paramsothy | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tharjini Thayaparan | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
VIGNESWARAMOORTHY PONNIAH | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAMALRAJ THIYAGARAJAH | Trustee | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PUSHPARATNAM CHANDRADAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SINNATHAMBY MUTHUCUMARASAMY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.