Accounts and annual returns THURLESTONE PARISH CHURCH BUILDING TRUST

Charity number: 1047587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 24 June 2024 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 22 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 08 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window