Accounts and annual returns PARENTS ASSOCIATION OF SANDHURST SCHOOL

Charity number: 1047591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 07 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 31 December 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 29 April 2022 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 March 2021 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required