Accounts and annual returns GOSPORT LIVING HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1047688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 24 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 24 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2023 07 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 07 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 26 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 10 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required