Financial history FRIENDS OF WHITCHURCH

Charity Number: 1047710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.56k £8.95k £1.20k £14.14k £16.48k
Total expenditure £2.66k £3.62k £344 £4.58k £6.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A