Accounts and annual returns MILTON KEYNES DRUG AND ALCOHOL SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1047829
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 06 April 2006 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time