Accounts and annual returns THE HEART OF GISSING (LAND AND BUILDINGS)

Charity number: 1047887
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 15 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 29 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 29 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 15 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 11 February 2013 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required