Financial history GARENDON HIGH SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1047933
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011
Total gross income £52.67k £69.40k £60.10k £40.50k £49.54k
Total expenditure £57.14k £60.56k £64.61k £36.01k £40.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A