Accounts and annual returns HOLY TRINITY CE JUNIOR SCHOOL (RIPON) SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1047997
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 02 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 13 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 27 September 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 05 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required