Financial history APPLEGARTH C P SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1048023
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.00k £8.01k £5.84k £8.69k £1.37k
Total expenditure £5.60k £6.49k £4.27k £6.38k £451
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A