Financial history MAGIC LANTERN

Charity number: 1048092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.15k £42.38k £31.30k £49.25k £39.12k
Total expenditure £49.52k £26.81k £43.17k £36.06k £40.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A