Financial history PETERPAN PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (RUNWELL)

Charity Number: 1048234
Charity reporting is up to date (227 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £128.08k £149.23k £183.84k £147.30k £176.18k
Total expenditure £94.34k £140.84k £181.90k £177.81k £161.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £159.96k £123.06k £151.79k
Income from government grants £112.22k N/A N/A N/A N/A