Financial history HEMINGBROUGH COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1048430
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.70k £7.63k £15.00k £11.16k £12.94k
Total expenditure £7.07k £8.08k £8.08k £17.90k £10.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A