Accounts and annual returns SUTTON WALDRON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1048439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 September 2024 236 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 March 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required