Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF YOULGRAVE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1048563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 30 September 2024 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 20 June 2023 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 06 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 July 2020 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required