Financial history BURITON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1048593
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £13.84k £16.63k £15.90k £15.90k £14.96k
Total expenditure £12.11k £13.64k £16.40k £19.04k £19.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0