Accounts and annual returns LAMBETH, SOUTHWARK AND LEWISHAM CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1048738
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 21 February 2007 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 February 2007 16 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time