Financial history HUMAN VALUES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1048755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £89.39k £48.73k £63.06k £72.38k £74.40k
Total expenditure £56.50k £52.27k £78.86k £95.95k £75.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A