Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL RUDOLF STEINER BOOK TRUST

Charity Number: 1048814
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2008 02 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2008 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2007 02 June 2008 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 Not Required
Annual return 23 February 2006 08 November 2007 320 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 February 2006 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2005 22 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2004 Not submitted