Financial history ROSEBUDS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1048963
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £39.42k £44.35k £46.03k £45.09k £37.34k
Total expenditure £29.20k £39.74k £41.27k £40.73k £44.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £37.47k £34.45k £27.70k