Financial history EASTERFORD PRE -SCHOOL

Charity number: 1049785
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £45.80k £30.59k £34.02k £34.48k £35.78k
Total expenditure £46.59k £30.57k £34.47k £37.75k £34.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0