Trustees WEST HALLAM VILLAGE PRE SCHOOL PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1049840
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Scott-Bebbington | Chair | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jayne McGuinn | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Curtis | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Briggs | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Gadsby | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.