Accounts and annual returns BELVIDERE SCHOOL P T A

Charity number: 1049930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 September 2024 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required