CHESHIRE AND WIRRAL PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold the Trust fund upon trust, to apply the income and so far as may be permissible the capital, for any charitable purpose or purposes relating to the National Health Service, including related research activities. To support a range of charitable and health related activities benefiting both patients and staff, which clearly demonstrate public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 11 October 1996: Standard registration
- CHESHIRE AND WIRRAL PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUNDS (Working name)
- CHESHIRE AND WIRRAL PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
- WIRRAL AND WEST CHESHIRE COMMUNITY NHS TRUST GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
- WIRRAL COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHESHIRE & WIRRAL PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.15k | £228.42k | £160.62k | £20.29k | £28.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.43k | £182.02k | £38.05k | £37.73k | £87.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10/10/1995 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 04/06/1997 AND 31/10/07
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITIBLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ASHTON HOUSE HOSPITAL FUND
- CHESHIRE AND WIRRAL PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- EAST CHESHIRE MENTAL HEALTH, LEARNING DISABILITIES AND ASSOCIATED SERVICES FUND
- MID CHESHIRE MENTAL HEALTH, LEARNING DISABILITIES AND ASSOCIATED SERVICES FUND
- PRIMARY CARE FUND
- ST CATHERINES HOSPITAL FUND
- THE MARJORIE VERA MARSHALL BURSARY
- VICTORIA CENTRAL HOSPITAL FUND
- 11 October 1996 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Finance Department
Redesmere
Countess of Chester Health Park
Liverpool Road
Chester
- Phone:
- 01244 393239
- Email:
- stephen.stokes@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window