Accounts and annual returns QUESTERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1050067
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2006 13 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2005 06 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2004 09 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required