Financial history Life Church Okehampton

Charity number: 1050313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.87k £61.66k £66.19k £72.54k £75.29k
Total expenditure £56.24k £49.44k £55.57k £66.89k £58.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A