Accounts and annual returns ALTON WESTBROOK DISTRICT GUIDES

Charity Number: 1050375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 30 December 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 19 May 2024 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 04 January 2023 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 22 January 2022 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 11 January 2023 379 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 06 April 2021 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required