Accounts and annual returns SELBY LONGMAN'S HILL COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1050386
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 05 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 21 October 2015 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required