Financial history SELLING C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1050407
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2004 31/07/2005 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008
Total gross income £4.03k £10.28k £12.94k £10.41k £10.08k
Total expenditure £3.63k £7.76k £6.04k £14.25k £11.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A