Financial history ST MATTHEW LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1050427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.34k £16.40k £5.14k £12.05k £7.41k
Total expenditure £4.75k £4.00k £5.08k £5.27k £15.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £2.67k N/A