Financial history ARTHINGWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1050514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.49k £11.09k £5.80k £8.33k £9.51k
Total expenditure £7.73k £6.20k £7.05k £10.62k £9.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A