Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF FINEDON SCHOOLS

Charity Number: 1050658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 06 June 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 11 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 November 2021 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 16 November 2020 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required