Accounts and annual returns CRANFORD GOOD NEIGHBOURS SCHEME

Charity Number: 1050706
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 07 June 2016 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 31 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 28 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 12 February 2015 12 days late
Annual return 31 March 2013 23 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required