Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SLINFOLD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1050788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 02 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required