Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF BLACKPOOL SUNRISE

Charity number: 1050852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.97k £6.80k £16.39k £11.79k £16.20k
Total expenditure £4.57k £11.28k £15.27k £9.49k £15.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A