Accounts and annual returns THE LIKEWISE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1050873
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 19 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 20 June 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 15 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 08 March 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 11 May 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 22 May 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 19 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 12 May 2005 On Time