Financial history WORTHWHILE OCCUPATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL KRAFTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1050876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £743.87k £720.46k £785.37k £993.75k £1.27m
Total expenditure £780.53k £679.87k £815.05k £1.02m £1.20m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.75k £28.45k £17.94k £56.22k £196.53k
Income - Other trading activities £7.48k £138 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £728.23k £581.38k £713.44k £936.48k £1.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £403 £164 £17 £324 £2.60k
Income - Other £0 £110.32k £53.97k £731 £630
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £780.53k £679.87k £815.05k £1.02m £1.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £25.07k £15.80k £21.78k £27.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0