Accounts and annual returns YOUTH AND COMMUNITY LINKS

Charity number: 1050904
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 August 2024 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 March 2022 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 March 2022 422 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required