Governing document SUTTON COLDFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS PARENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1050942

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 SEPTEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 13TH OCTOBER 1999, 31 OCTOBER 2001, 22 OCTOBER 2003 AND 4 MARCH 2010. as amended on 08 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.