Accounts and annual returns THE EAST FINCHLEY ADVICE SERVICE

Charity number: 1050951
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2011 20 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 25 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2010 28 February 2011 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 07 March 2011 30 days late
Annual return 05 April 2009 07 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 11 August 2009 On Time